TX HB1938 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to curriculum requirements in American and Texas history at institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to curriculum requirements in American and Texas history at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R] |
Rep. Steve Toth [R] | Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |