TX HB1935 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying of certain knives; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying of certain knives; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1064 (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-09HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-09HouseRecord vote
2017-05-09HousePassed
2017-05-09HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-08HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-08HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-08HouseAmended
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-08HousePostponed
2017-05-08HouseLaid out as postponed business
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-05HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-03HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-03HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-15HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback