TX HB1930 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a charter school by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a charter school by the Texas Juvenile Justice Department.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1122 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#1122 |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
JUVENILE JUSTICE BOARD, TEXAS
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice