TX HB1926 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2013 - 75% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of the state virtual school network and courses provided through other distance learning arrangements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of the state virtual school network and courses provided through other distance learning arrangements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-26 - House - HB 1926Third Reading House (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-04 - House - HB 1926Third Reading House (Y: 104 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Filed without the Governor's signature
2013-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26SenateRecord vote
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseRecord vote
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2013-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2013-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2013-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2013-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2013-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2013-05-24SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-24SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2013-05-24SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2013-05-24HouseHouse appoints conferees
2013-05-24HouseHouse requests conference committee
2013-05-24HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateAmended
2013-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-05-22SenateMotion withdrawn
2013-05-22SenateMotion to suspend regular order of business
2013-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2013-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2013-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-16SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-14SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-08SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Education
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-04HouseRecord vote
2013-05-04HousePassed
2013-05-04HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-03HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-03HouseRecord vote
2013-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2013-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-03HouseRecord vote
2013-05-03HouseAmendment fails of adoption
2013-05-03HouseMotion to table fails
2013-05-03HouseAmendment(s) offered
2013-05-03HouseAmendment tabled
2013-05-03HouseAmended
2013-05-03HouseAmended
2013-05-03HouseAmended
2013-05-03HouseAmendment withdrawn
2013-05-03HouseAmended
2013-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-23HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-04-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-23HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-05HouseReferred to Public Education
2013-03-05HouseRead first time
2013-02-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback