TX HB1925 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of the Texas Farm and Ranch Lands Conservation Program to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Title
Relating to the transfer of the Texas Farm and Ranch Lands Conservation Program to the Parks and Wildlife Department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - HB 1925Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-20 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-20 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-18 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-17 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-17 | House | Passed |
2015-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-16 | House | Amended |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-31 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-31 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Governor
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions