TX HB1925 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to voter registration; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to voter registration; creating an offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Harless [R] | Rep. Jodie Laubenberg [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Todd Smith [R] |
Rep. Vicki Truitt [R] | Rep. William Zedler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-08 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-03-07 | Read first time | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage
Elections--Administration
Elections--Election Officers
Elections--General
Elections--Registration & Suffrage