TX HB1921 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the amount of a fine and costs discharged by a defendant while confined in jail or engaged in labor.
Title
Relating to the amount of a fine and costs discharged by a defendant while confined in jail or engaged in labor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-21 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |