TX HB1921 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the modernization of correctional facilities operated by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to the modernization of correctional facilities operated by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS BOARD OF
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF