TX HB1917 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-10 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the disaster response loan fund and the permissible uses of that fund; making an appropriation; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the creation of the disaster response loan fund and the permissible uses of that fund; making an appropriation; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Amended RV#1052 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | House | Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution |
2019-05-07 | House | Record vote RV#1052 |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-07 | House | Amended 1-Murphy |
2019-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Amended 1-Murphy |
2019-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-24 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT, DIVISION OF THE DEPT. OF PUBLIC SAFETY
GENERAL LAND OFFICE
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control