TX HB191 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposal of pesticides.
Title
Relating to the disposal of pesticides.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1725 (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Point of order overruled RV#469 (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Point of order overruled RV#469 (Y: 129 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1725 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | House | Record vote RV#469 |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed |
2019-04-17 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 8, Section 1(a)(1) |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock |
2019-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Environment
Environment--General
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PESTICIDES & HERBICIDES
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE
AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF
Environment
Environment--General
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PESTICIDES & HERBICIDES
TEXAS A&M AGRILIFE EXTENSION SERVICE