TX HB1908 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-04 - Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for an application for a writ of habeas corpus filed in certain felony cases.
Title
Relating to the procedure for an application for a writ of habeas corpus filed in certain felony cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Same As) 2023-02-17 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Personnel
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
HABEAS CORPUS
Courts--Personnel
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Posttrial Procedure
HABEAS CORPUS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1908 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01908I.htm |