TX HB1907 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a statewide all payor claims database to increase public transparency of health care data and improve quality of health care in this state.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a statewide all payor claims database to increase public transparency of health care data and improve quality of health care in this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1179 (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-14 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1179 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Oliverson |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1135 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
INTERNET
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON