TX HB19 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to mental health and substance use resources for certain school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to mental health and substance use resources for certain school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1731 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#363 (Y: 127 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#339 (Y: 123 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1731
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-17HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-17HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenatePassed
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#363
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#339
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-27HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB914 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB19
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00019I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00019H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00019E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00019S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00019F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB19&RcdVtNo=339&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB19&RcdVtNo=363&Ch=H&Dt=04/16/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB19&RcdVtNo=1731&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback