TX HB1884 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the penalties for certain littering offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the penalties for certain littering offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1781 (Y: 136 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Passed (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#924 (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateAmended
2017-05-22SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-05-10SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback