TX HB185 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of chronically absent students as students at risk of dropping out of school and the collection and reporting of data regarding those students.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of chronically absent students as students at risk of dropping out of school and the collection and reporting of data regarding those students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#526 (Y: 113 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#526 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-25 | House | Point of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2023-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Tinderholt |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice