TX HB1849 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the possession and administration of epinephrine auto-injectors in day-care centers; limiting liability.
Title
Relating to the possession and administration of epinephrine auto-injectors in day-care centers; limiting liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#132 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-02 | House | Record vote RV#132 |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-01 | House | Amended 2-Ramos |
2019-04-01 | House | Amended 1-Klick |
2019-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1735 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Day Care
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PHYSICIANS
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PHYSICIANS