TX HB1828 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorization by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board for certain public junior colleges to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-26HouseMeeting cancelled
2017-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-25HousePosting rule suspended
2017-03-09HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-09HouseRead first time
2017-02-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback