TX HB1819 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2015 - 75% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the date for the election of directors of the Hill Country Underground Water Conservation District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the date for the election of directors of the Hill Country Underground Water Conservation District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-30 - House - HB 1819Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10 Effective immediately
2015-06-10 Filed without the Governor's signature
2015-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-22HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenatePassed
2015-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-20SenateRecord vote
2015-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2015-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-13HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2015-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-05-04SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HouseRecord vote
2015-04-30HousePassed
2015-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-30HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-12HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2015-03-12HouseRead first time
2015-03-03HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2015-02-23HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback