TX HB1819 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to liability for injuring a trespassing sheep or goat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to liability for injuring a trespassing sheep or goat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-26 - House - HB 1819Third Reading House (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - SUSPEND CONSTITUTIONAL RULE (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective on 9/1/13
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenatePassed
2013-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-20SenateRecord vote
2013-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-13SenatePosting rule suspended
2013-04-30SenateReferred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
2013-04-30SenateRead first time
2013-04-29SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-26HouseRecord vote
2013-04-26HousePassed
2013-04-26HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-26HouseRecord vote
2013-04-26HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2013-04-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-26HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-26HouseLaid out as postponed business
2013-04-25HousePostponed
2013-04-25HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-25HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-22HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-03HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-03HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-04HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2013-03-04HouseRead first time
2013-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback