TX HB1783 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of a school employee to report a crime, persons subject to the prohibition on coercing another into suppressing or failing to report information to a law enforcement agency, and the reporting of criminal history record information of educators and other public school employees who engage in certain misconduct; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the right of a school employee to report a crime, persons subject to the prohibition on coercing another into suppressing or failing to report information to a law enforcement agency, and the reporting of criminal history record information of educators and other public school employees who engage in certain misconduct; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 1783Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1783Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 1783Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers