TX HB1767 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the consideration of employee compensation and benefits in establishing the rates of gas utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the consideration of employee compensation and benefits in establishing the rates of gas utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1686 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-15 - House - Laid out as postponed business RV#337 (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Amendment tabled RV#314 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective immediately
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-22HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1686
2019-05-22HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-15HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-14HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Rodríguez
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-30SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-04-16SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-15HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#337
2019-04-15HousePassed
2019-04-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-12HousePostponed 4/15/19 9:00 AM
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-11HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11HouseRecord vote RV#314
2019-04-11HouseAmendment tabled 1-J. González
2019-04-11HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-11HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-20HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1513 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1767
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01767I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01767H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01767S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01767F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1767&RcdVtNo=314&Ch=H&Dt=04/11/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1767&RcdVtNo=337&Ch=H&Dt=04/15/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-14-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1767&RcdVtNo=1686&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2019

Bill Comments

feedback