TX HB1766 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-06HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-06HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-14HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2017-03-14HouseRead first time
2017-02-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback