TX HB1713 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reimbursing property owners in certain counties for damages caused by certain criminal activities; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to reimbursing property owners in certain counties for damages caused by certain criminal activities; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
County Government--General
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Law Enforcement
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General