TX HB1708 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a voting system that produces a voter-verifiable paper record.
Title
Relating to a voting system that produces a voter-verifiable paper record.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed |