TX HB1708 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an electronic voting system that produces a voter-verifiable paper record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an electronic voting system that produces a voter-verifiable paper record.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-10HouseRead first time
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback