TX HB170 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulation of the sale, distribution, possession, use, and advertising of e-cigarettes, cigarettes, and tobacco products; creating criminal offenses.
Title
Relating to regulation of the sale, distribution, possession, use, and advertising of e-cigarettes, cigarettes, and tobacco products; creating criminal offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Nicole Collier [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Jason Isaac [R] |
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. Elliott Naishtat [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - SUSPEND NECESSARY RULES (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-11 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-05 | House | Returned to Calendars Committee |
2015-05-05 | House | Point of order sustained |
2015-05-05 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |