TX HB17 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the Texas Higher Education Innovation Accelerator for public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the Texas Higher Education Innovation Accelerator for public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#808 (Y: 120 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#713 (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-15SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HouseRecord vote
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback