TX HB1694 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a defense to prosecution for certain offenses involving possession of small amounts of controlled substances, marihuana, dangerous drugs, or abusable volatile chemicals, or possession of drug paraphernalia for defendants seeking assistance for a suspected overdose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a defense to prosecution for certain offenses involving possession of small amounts of controlled substances, marihuana, dangerous drugs, or abusable volatile chemicals, or possession of drug paraphernalia for defendants seeking assistance for a suspected overdose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Amended RV#384 (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-22HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#384
2021-04-21HousePassed as amended
2021-04-21HouseAmended 1-Raney
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-20HouseAmended 1-Kacal
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-31HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-31HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB811 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1694
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01694I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01694H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01694E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01694S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01694F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01694H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01694H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01694I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01694H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01694E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01694E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1694&RcdVtNo=384&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=51

Bill Comments

feedback