TX HB1693 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to documentation for a motor vehicle title.
Title
Relating to documentation for a motor vehicle title.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Diana Arevalo [D] | Sen. Charles Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-06 - House - Amended RV#888 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-06 | House | Amended |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General