TX HB1682 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for the repair, remodeling, or maintenance of aircraft.
Title
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for the repair, remodeling, or maintenance of aircraft.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Paul Workman [R] |
Rep. Charles Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-27 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Property Interests--Personal Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Taxation--Sales
Transportation
Transportation--Aviation
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB1682 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB01682I.htm |