TX HB1672 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Title
Relating to use of electric energy storage facilities in the ERCOT power region.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Rep. Sam Harless [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB415 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB2818 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
HB2818 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ELECTRIC RELIABILITY COUNCIL OF TEXAS
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric