TX HB1664 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the requirement of certain administrators of certain educational entities to report certain educator misconduct to the State Board for Educator Certification.
Title
Relating to the requirement of certain administrators of certain educational entities to report certain educator misconduct to the State Board for Educator Certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1476 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
REGIONAL EDUCATION SERVICE CENTERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1664 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01664I.htm |