TX HB166 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Defense & Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to waiver programs for recipients of the Purple Heart provided by toll project entities.
Title
Relating to waiver programs for recipients of the Purple Heart provided by toll project entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB166 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00166I.htm |