TX HB1658 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the refund of a cash bond to a defendant in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to the refund of a cash bond to a defendant in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-08 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-07 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-05 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |