TX HB1648 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to arbitration related to certain risks under certain insurance policies and contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to arbitration related to certain risks under certain insurance policies and contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback