TX HB1632 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to students eligible to receive compensatory, intensive, and accelerated instructional services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to students eligible to receive compensatory, intensive, and accelerated instructional services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#633 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Education
2019-04-25SenateRead first time
2019-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-24HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-24HouseRecord vote RV#633
2019-04-24HousePassed
2019-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-23HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-03-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1241 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback