TX HB1626 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of certain areas as banking or credit union development districts to encourage the establishment of branches of banks or credit unions in those areas.
Title
Relating to the designation of certain areas as banking or credit union development districts to encourage the establishment of branches of banks or credit unions in those areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] |
Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - HB 1626Third Reading House (Y: 99 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-07 | House | Amended |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2015-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |