TX HB1621 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to utilization review and notice and appeal of certain adverse determinations by utilization review agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to utilization review and notice and appeal of certain adverse determinations by utilization review agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-29 - House - HB 1621Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 1621Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-29HouseRecord vote
2015-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-11SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-11SenateRead first time
2015-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-05HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HouseRecord vote
2015-05-05HousePassed
2015-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-05HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-05HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-05-05HouseAmended
2015-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-05HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-01HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-30HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2015-04-30HouseWithdrawn from calendar
2015-04-30HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-04-27HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-04-21HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-09HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2015-03-09HouseRead first time
2015-02-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback