TX HB160 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-04 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reimbursement of state funds used on out-of-state travel by elected officers.
Title
Relating to the reimbursement of state funds used on out-of-state travel by elected officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRAVEL
Elections--Campaign Financing
Elections--Candidates
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Law Enforcement
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TRAVEL