TX HB16 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-21 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, and stalking at public and private postsecondary educational institutions.
Title
Relating to sexual harassment, sexual assault, dating violence, and stalking at public and private postsecondary educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#593 (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#574 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#574 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STALKING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
SEXUAL HARASSMENT
STALKING