TX HB159 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#670 (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-21HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenatePassed
2021-05-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-20SenateRecord vote
2021-05-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#670
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB180 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB159
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00159I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00159E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00159S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00159F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00159I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00159H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00159E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00159E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB159&RcdVtNo=670&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-20-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments

feedback