TX HB1586 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of clinician-administered drugs.
Title
Relating to health benefit plan coverage of clinician-administered drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Amended RV#1166 (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1166 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Romero |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-13 | House | Amended 1-Lucio |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
Health--General
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS