TX HB158 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a pilot program to provide Medicaid coverage of doula services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a pilot program to provide Medicaid coverage of doula services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#681 (Y: 105 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#681
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-02-25HouseRead first time
2020-11-09HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback