TX HB1570 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Brazos River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; specifying grounds for the removal of a member of the board of directors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Brazos River Authority, following recommendations of the Sunset Advisory Commission; specifying grounds for the removal of a member of the board of directors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#359 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenatePassed
2021-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#359
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-16HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2021-04-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-24HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2021-03-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB715 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Left pending in committee
SB715 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1570
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01570I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01570H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01570E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01570S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01570F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01570I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01570H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01570H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01570E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01570E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1570&RcdVtNo=359&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=5

Bill Comments 750

feedback