TX HB157 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-05 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the filing of an application for a place on the general primary election ballot.
Title
Relating to the filing of an application for a place on the general primary election ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-29 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-04-29 | Read first time | |
2011-04-26 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-25 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Record vote | |
2011-04-21 | Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-21 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-21 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-30 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-02-11 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |