TX HB156 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to establishing a pilot program in designated public high schools in certain municipalities for placement of students in Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps programs as an alternative to placement in disciplinary or juvenile justice alternative education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to establishing a pilot program in designated public high schools in certain municipalities for placement of students in Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps programs as an alternative to placement in disciplinary or juvenile justice alternative education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1877 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective immediately
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-26HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2017-05-26HouseRecord vote
2017-05-26HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2017-05-25HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2017-05-24HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-24SenateRecord vote
2017-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAmended
2017-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-12SenateReferred to Education
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback