TX HB1550 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confinement in a county jail of a person pending a transfer to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice and to the reimbursement of certain costs of confinement.
Title
Relating to the confinement in a county jail of a person pending a transfer to the Texas Department of Criminal Justice and to the reimbursement of certain costs of confinement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
County Government
County Government--General
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF