TX HB1535 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-33)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the medical use of low-THC cannabis by patients with certain medical conditions and the establishment of compassionate-use institutional review boards to evaluate and approve proposed research programs to study the medical use of low-THC cannabis in the treatment of certain patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the medical use of low-THC cannabis by patients with certain medical conditions and the establishment of compassionate-use institutional review boards to evaluate and approve proposed research programs to study the medical use of low-THC cannabis in the treatment of certain patients.

Sponsors

Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Four Price [R]Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]
Rep. Donna Howard [D]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Rafael Anchia [D]Rep. Michelle Beckley [D]
Rep. Diego Bernal [D]Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. John Bucy [D]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D]Rep. Terry Canales [D]Rep. Jeff Cason [R]
Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Sheryl Cole [D]Rep. Nicole Collier [D]Rep. David Cook [R]
Rep. Philip Cortez [D]Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D]Rep. Yvonne Davis [D]Rep. Joe Deshotel [D]
Rep. Alex Dominguez [D]Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D]Rep. Jessica Gonzalez [D]Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D]
Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Abel Herrero [D]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Lacey Hull [R]
Rep. Todd Hunter [R]Rep. Celia Israel [D]Rep. Jacey Jetton [R]Rep. Julie Johnson [D]
Rep. Stan Lambert [R]Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ray Lopez [D]
Rep. Armando Martinez [D]Rep. Terry Meza [D]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Ina Minjarez [D]
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D]Rep. Eddie Morales [D]Rep. Victoria Neave [D]Rep. Claudia Ordaz Perez [D]
Rep. Lina Ortega [D]Rep. Leo Pacheco [D]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]
Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D]Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Richard Raymond [D]Rep. Ron Reynolds [D]
Rep. Eddie Rodriguez [D]Rep. Ramon Romero [D]Rep. Toni Rose [D]Rep. Jon Rosenthal [D]
Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Shelby Slawson [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. James Talarico [D]
Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. James White [R]Rep. Erin Zwiener [D]Sen. Charles Schwertner [R]
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Cesar Blanco [D]Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R]
Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D]Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D]Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D]
Sen. Nathan Johnson [D]Sen. Eddie Lucio [D]Sen. Jose Menendez [D]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]Sen. Kel Seliger [R]Sen. John Whitmire [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1688 (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Read 3rd time RV#535 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1688
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-24SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-20SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-20SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#535
2021-04-29HousePassed
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-28HouseAmended 1-Klick
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2021-03-11HouseRead first time
2021-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1535
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01535I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01535H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01535E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01535S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01535F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01535H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01535I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01535H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01535E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01535E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01535S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01535S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01535F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1535&RcdVtNo=535&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=119
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1535&RcdVtNo=1688&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback