TX HB1509 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to enhancing the criminal penalties for certain repeat and habitual offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to enhancing the criminal penalties for certain repeat and habitual offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#733 (Y: 102 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#733
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-08HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-08HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2007 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback