TX HB1502 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing military voters on active duty overseas to receive and cast a ballot electronically.
Title
Relating to allowing military voters on active duty overseas to receive and cast a ballot electronically.
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Berman [R] | Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Raul Torres [R] |
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-04 | Amended | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Election Officers
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
SECRETARY OF STATE
Elections--Early Voting
Elections--Election Officers
Electronic Information Systems
Military & Veterans
SECRETARY OF STATE